MA H285 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4678
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-9)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote global trade and economic development through biliteracy education. Education.
Title
To promote global trade and economic development through biliteracy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4678 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4860 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4868 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see H4732
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4702 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Rejected
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4732 (Similar To) 2018-08-13 - Sections returned with veto (see section 20 and 62) referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4860 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4868 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Text of an amendment, see H4732
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H285 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H285.pdf |