MA H2294 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit eminent domain takings for the purpose of economic development. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the defense of private property rights through the prevention of abusive eminent domain takings in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
H215 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S187 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S81 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4397
S180 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
H4711 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4975 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2294 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2294.pdf |