MA S1775 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2799
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to disability retirees and restoration to service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to disability retirees and restoration to service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Accompanied H2799 |
2021-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2579 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S846 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S773 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1274
S748 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2799 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
H2613 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1712 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2613
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2634 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4011 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2021
H4052 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4011
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2579 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2764 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2817 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5244
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3644 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S846 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2815
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S773 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1274
S748 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2799 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
H2613 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1712 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2613
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2634 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1775 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1775.pdf |