MA H2634 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to increasing the amount of hours that retired public employees may work for certain additional public service. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cap on work hours for retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2692 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S1765 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1662 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback