MA S1757 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Cheryl A. Cole, an employee of the office of Medicaid. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Cheryl A. Cole, an employee of the office of Medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | House concurred |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1757 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1757.pdf |