MA S1707 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate January as peace officer history month. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating January as peace officer history month
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Rep. James Miceli [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1707 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1707.pdf |