MA S168 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to regulate bodyworks. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating bodyworks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/28/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2072 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1936 (Similar To) 2019-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1993 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S163 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1359 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1865 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S487 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
S1421 (Similar To) 2019-08-22 - Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1365 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4047 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2321 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback