MA S1677 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the Rose Fitzgerald Kennedy Greenway as the official organic public park of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating the Rose Fitzgerald Kennedy Greenway as the official organic public park of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1677 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1677.pdf |