MA S1677 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2324
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote and and advance motorcycle safety. Transportation.
Title
To promote and advance motorcycle safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2324 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read second |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2324 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2013 from 01:30 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2324 (Replaced by) 2014-07-31 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1677 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1677.pdf |