MA S1597 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Probation Service. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Concerning the Massachusetts Probation Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2431 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3859 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2022
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
H1884 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4066 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2021
H3859 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2022
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
H3917 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4302
H3987 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
H1884 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4066 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1597 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1597.pdf |