MA S1589 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2086
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to water meter testing fees. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to water meter testing fees
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] |
Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2086 |
2013-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2086 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1589 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1589.pdf |