MA S1586 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to land conservation. Revenue.
Title
Relative to land conservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3855 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1657 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S1495 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1585 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S838 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
S2007 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H879 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
H2614 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1495 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1585 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S838 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
S2007 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H879 (Similar To) 2018-02-20 - Accompanied H3327
H2614 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1586 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1586.pdf |