MA S1585 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3855
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to land conservation incentives. Revenue.
Title
Relative to land conservation incentives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3855 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1657 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
S36 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1586 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H2614 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H1503 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2598 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S36 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1586 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H2614 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
H1503 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2612 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2598 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1585 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1585.pdf |