MA S1657 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3855
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the land conservation tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Increasing the land conservation tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3855 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1575 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1651 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1494 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1665 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H3779 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1651 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1494 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1664 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1665 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1610 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H1485 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H3779 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3855 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1657 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1657.pdf |