MA S1519 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4640

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to out-of-hospital birth access and safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-11HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4640
2022-02-22HouseHouse concurred
2022-02-17SenateReporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1381 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied H2266
H2341 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
S188 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2568
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H4640 (Replaced by) 2022-05-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback