MA S1501 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to Joseph Suppa. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing the State Retirement Board to grant creditable service to Joseph Suppa
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H52 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H2309 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H52 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2451 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1501 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1501.pdf |