MA S2257 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize employees of the city of Fall River the ability to apply with the Fall River Retirement Board to purchase credible service for military service. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing employees of the city of Fall River the ability to apply with the Fall River Retirement Board to purchase credible service for military service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-08-31 | House | Enacted |
2020-08-27 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-16 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Order of the Day |
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 22, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-17 | House | House concurred |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3868 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2370 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2165 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2351 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2159 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1581 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2160 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2257 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2257.pdf |