MA H3868 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. DeCoste of Norwell, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of David F. DeCoste that the Massachusetts Teachers’ Retirement System be directed to authorize Daniel P. Schwemin to purchase creditable service. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to creditable service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-10HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2019-04-23HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S2257 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2370 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2165 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2351 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2159 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback