MA S1461 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to diabetes prevention. Public Health.
Title
Relative to diabetes prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-02-15 | House | Accompanied by H2313 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1454 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S761 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied H1290
H2313 (Replaces) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1461
S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S216 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S315 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H665
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S1454 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S761 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied H1290
H2313 (Replaces) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1461
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1461 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1461.pdf |