MA H2313 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1461
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S1461
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to diabetes prevention. Public Health.
Title
Relative to diabetes prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Accompanied S1461 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3628 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1972 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
H4156 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S359 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H596
S1157 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
S453 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1461 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2638 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H2587 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H1972 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
S1189 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied H2046
H4156 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S359 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H596
S1157 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4604
S453 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S1461 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2313 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2313.pdf |