MA S1445 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide mental wellness training for police officers. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Providing mental wellness training for police officers
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Sen. Barry Finegold [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2173
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S907 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1586 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2200 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1445 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1445.pdf |