MA S1444 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to retirement systems and pensions for correctional officers. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to retirement systems and pensions for correctional officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-02-22SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-11-10JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1410 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1302 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2309 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1376 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1378 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1265 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1300 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1338 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback