MA S1430 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to inmate telephone calls. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to inmate telephone call rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S652 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S801 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3304 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2287 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
S174 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S652 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S801 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S951 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3304 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2287 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2224 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H4019 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 48 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1430 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1430.pdf |