MA H3304 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5081
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to telephone service for inmates in all correctional and other penal institutions in the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to telephone service for inmates in all correctional and other penal institutions in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5081 |
2019-10-03 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3431 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1724 (Similar To) 2020-11-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5098
H1539 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1338 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1430 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1391 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1357 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1372 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3452 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H1369 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1724 (Similar To) 2020-11-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5098
H1539 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1338 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1430 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1391 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1357 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1372 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3452 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H1369 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3304 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3304.pdf |