MA H1724 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the mental health examination process of inmates at places of detention. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving the mental health examination process of inmates at places of detention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H158 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1705 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H980 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H908 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3431 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S731 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
S656 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
H1751 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H3304 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1135 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2276 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback