MA H908 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit benefit limits and exclusions for behavioral health disorders on certain disability insurance policies. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring mental health parity for disability policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H910 (Similar To) 2019-11-22 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S588 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - New draft substituted, see S2519
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S588 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - New draft substituted, see S2519
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H908 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H908.pdf |