MA S1400 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees. Public Service.
Title
Further regulating group insurance benefits for state employees and retired state employees
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
Sen. Thomas Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H2359 |
2015-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2359 (Replaces) 2015-07-28 - Accompanied S1400
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1333 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1765 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1687 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S973 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2227 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2016
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1275 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1327 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1333 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1765 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1687 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S973 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2227 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2016
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1275 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1400 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1400.pdf |