MA S138 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Community Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Community Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to use funds for flood control infrastructure and floodplain preservation. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Authorizing municipalities to use funds for flood control infrastructure and floodplain preservation
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. Kelly Pease [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4344 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4344 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S138.pdf |