MA S133 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2534

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to enhance, update and protect the 2013 motor vehicle right to repair law and consumer rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance, update and protect the 2013 motor vehicle right to repair law and consumer rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2534
2020-01-06JointHearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S148 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H246 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S107 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H275 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H227 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H224 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H284 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H323 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback