MA S107 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H218

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to digital right to repair. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the digital right to repair

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-04-27SenateAccompanied by H218
2019-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S148 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3142 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
S770 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H246 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2075 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2994 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H2998
H1249 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H2002 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H4045 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H218 (Replaces) 2020-04-27 - Accompanied S107

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback