MA H227 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the motor vehicle right to repair law and consumer rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To enhance, update and protect the 2013 Motor Vehicle Right to Repair Law and Consumer Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5043 |
2020-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2057 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2198
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H323 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2198 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S2216 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2245
S2245 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2057 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2198
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H323 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2198 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - New draft substituted, see S2216
S2216 (Similar To) 2019-06-06 - Reprinted as amended, see S2245
S2245 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H227 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H227.pdf |