MA H275 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the motor vehicle right to repair law and consumer rights. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance, update and protect the 2013 motor vehicle right to repair law and consumer rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-06JointHearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H246 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H224 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H340 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H237 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H307 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback