MA S1280 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1317
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of lead paint on outdoor structures. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting the use of lead paint on outdoor structures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Accompanied by S1317 |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S468 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
H2858 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied S1937
S1937 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1317 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1280
H2858 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Accompanied S1937
S1937 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1317 (Replaces) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied S1280
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1280 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1280.pdf |