MA H2858 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied S1937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-16 - Accompanied S1937
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to improving outdoor lighting and increasing dark-sky visibility. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Improving outdoor lighting and increasing dark-sky visibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | Senate | Accompanied S1937 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1937 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2858 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2858.pdf |