MA S1192 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the town charter of Groton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town charter of Groton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-11-13 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-12 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-08-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-08-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-04-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1818 (Similar To) 2019-09-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2019
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S1203 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S2406
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
S2239 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - New draft substituted, see S2303
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2303 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2019
H4036 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 310 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1192.pdf |