MA S114 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect the health and safety of puppies and kittens in cities and towns. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting the health and safety of puppies and kittens in cities and towns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-27SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-28JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-06HouseHouse concurred
2019-05-02SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S175 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
S1204 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
H1823 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
H1774 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback