VA HB1397 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Enacted, Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/24)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; manufactured home park; notice of sale and relocation expenses. Requires a manufactured home park owner to provide notice to the Department of Housing and Community Development and each manufactured home park tenant 90 days prior to unconditionally accepting an offer to purchase a manufactured home park. The bill grants a right of first refusal for localities located in Planning District 8. The bill provides for $5,000 in relocation expenses for a manufactured home owner if a rental agreement is terminated due to the sale of the manufactured home park to a buyer that is going to redevelop the park and change its use. Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; manufactured home park; notice of sale and relocation expenses. Requires a manufactured home park owner to provide notice to the Department of Housing and Community Development and each manufactured home park tenant 90 days prior to unconditionally accepting an offer to purchase a manufactured home park. The bill grants a right of first refusal for localities located in Planning District 8. The bill provides for $5,000 in relocation expenses for a manufactured home owner if a rental agreement is terminated due to the sale of the manufactured home park to a buyer that is going to redevelop the park and change its use.
Title
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; manufactured home park, notice of sale and relocation expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1397ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (54-Y 45-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1397ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 24108598D-S1 (51-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB1397S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108598D-S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (11-Y 4-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108598D-S1 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1397H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107465D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107465D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 8-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24105316D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 1 | 1308.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |