MA H1823 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2760
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2760
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2760
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to remedy for the sale of sick puppies and kittens. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relating to the remedy for the sale of sick puppies and kittens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2760 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-26 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1419 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H845 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5071
H1397 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H338 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H843 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2760 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Bill reported by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1419 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H845 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5071
H1397 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H338 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H843 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
S2760 (Replaced by) 2020-06-11 - Bill reported by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1823 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1823.pdf |