MA H1774 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-11)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to oversight of dogs and cats by cities and towns. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting the health and safety of puppies and kittens in cities and towns

Sponsors

Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]
Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. John Velis [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. John Lawn [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-02HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 8, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-27SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-26HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 23, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-05-28JointHearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H341 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S216 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback