MA S1138 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2342
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate special permits. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Further regulating special permits
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2342 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2342 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S1345 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1330 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1379 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2336 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - New draft substituted, see S2610
S2342 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4539 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Reported by H4670
S2615 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1138.pdf |