MA S2615 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, July 18, 2018 - The committee on Rules to whom was referred the Senate Bill making technical changes to the laws regulating a certain notarial act (Senate, No. 2312),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2615).
Title
Making technical changes to the laws regulating a certain notarial act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-07-19 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Substituted for S2312 |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2312 |
2018-07-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S970 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1687 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
S1687 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S314 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S1156 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
S989 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2186
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2615 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2615.pdf |