MA S1129 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the growth of hemp. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to the growth of hemp
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Accompanied H3535 |
2019-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-26 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2019-04-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
H3519 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
H3544 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
H3545 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4526
H3905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Adopted, see H3535
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
H3519 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H3535 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Passed to be engrossed - 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 79)
H3544 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Accompanied H3535
H3545 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4526
H3905 (Similar To) 2019-06-19 - Adopted, see H3535
H4001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4528
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1129.pdf |