MA S1108 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2665
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve the quality of courthouse security. The Judiciary.
Title
Improving the quality of courthouse security
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2665 |
2021-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2499 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H1782 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1890 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1501 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2209 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S520 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2077 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H3272 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1577 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H724 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H1782 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2490 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1890 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1024 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1501 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2209 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S520 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S399 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S2665 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2077 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H3272 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H1577 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H724 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1108 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1108.pdf |