MA S1067 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow the city of Everett to increase the fee for second class motor dealers licenses. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Allowing the city of Everett to increase the fee for second class motor dealers licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-05-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428 |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing on 05/12/2015 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in 428 cancelled |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1571 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2276 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - New draft substituted, see S2517
S2374 (Similar To) 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2016
H3481 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H3638 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2276 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - New draft substituted, see S2517
S2374 (Similar To) 2016-10-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 294 of the Acts of 2016
H3481 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H3638 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1067.pdf |