MA S1571 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require periodic regulatory review at the Department of Revenue. Revenue.
Title
To require periodic regulatory review at the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2016-02-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S1661 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1415 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
S1526 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
S1661 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1415 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1485 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2631 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1571 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1571.pdf |