MA H917 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to dogs brought into the Commonwealth by animal rescue organizations. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to dogs brought into the Commonwealth by animal rescue organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1930 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H306 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H949 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S230 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S595 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H949
S2397 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2130 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H306 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H949 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S230 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
S595 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H949
S2397 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2130 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1341 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H917 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H917.pdf |