MA S230 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2734
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ban the retail sale of cats and dogs in pet shops. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To ban the retail sale of cats and dogs in pet shops
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2734 |
2021-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-27 | House | House concurred |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H384 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
H1845 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
H1845 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1073 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S230 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S230.pdf |