MA H2547 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-29)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing for the care and transportation of police dogs injured in the line of duty. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the care and transportation of police dogs injured in the line of duty (Nero's Law)

Sponsors

Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Rep. Alyson Sullivan [R]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Adam Scanlon [D]Rep. David Vieira [R]
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Sen. Susan Moran [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]
Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]
Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. David DeCoste [R]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]
Rep. William Straus [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. Kelly Pease [R]
Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Patricia Haddad [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. David Muradian [R]
Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Jacob Oliveira [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]
Rep. Kip Diggs [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Sheila Harrington [R]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. James Murphy [D]
Rep. Andres Vargas [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Carol Doherty [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Rep. Sally Kerans [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]
Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Paul Frost [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]
Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. James Kelcourse [R]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Marc Lombardo [R]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2021-06-30JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
S2573 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2022
H4431 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Text of an amendment, see S2573

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback