MA H917 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to curtail gang activity and witness intimidation by the establishment of municipal judicial safety zones. The Judiciary.
Title
To curtail gang activity and witness intimidation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S975 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S979 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S852 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H745 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S979 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S852 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S2158 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H917 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H917.pdf |