MA H907 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the continuity of care for mental health treatment. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the continuity of care of mental health treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-02HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-30JointHearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
2019-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1172 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S1311 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
S561 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3556 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4518

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback